Biotherm Hydronic, Inc. v. Kemna Enterprises et al

Defendant: Kemna Enterprises and Satellite Specialized Transportation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Biotherm Hydronic, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv01206
Filed: March 9, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Commercial/ICC Rates/etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 12 Motion to Appear by Telephone at case management conference. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 21, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James finding as moot 11 Motion to Appear by Telephone; granting 13 Motion to Appear by Telephone (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 21, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 14 Motion to Appear by Telephone (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 26, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CMC. Status Report due by 7/5/2012.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/26/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
June 26, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 20 Stipulation selecting Mediation (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
July 3, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Status Report due by 10/24/2012.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/3/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
January 3, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: CASE STATUS. Status Report due by 1/17/2013.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/3/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
January 31, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE re 27 Stipulation filed by Kemna Enterprises. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/31/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biotherm Hydronic, Inc. v. Kemna Enterprises et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kemna Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Satellite Specialized Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Biotherm Hydronic, Inc.
Represented By: Shannon Kathryne Paton
Represented By: James Egan Sell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.