Turner et al v. General Electronic Company et al

Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., General Electronic Company and Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Plaintiff: Virginia Turner, William Turner, Linda Lee Turner, Kenneth Turner and Alice M. King
Case Number: 3:2012cv01600
Filed: March 30, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Hon. Edward M. Chen no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/22/14. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
September 29, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT STATUS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/29/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
November 26, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 STIPULATION DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY filed by Kenneth Turner, Linda Lee Turner, William Turner, Alice M. King, Virginia Turner. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/26/2014. General Electronic Company terminated. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
April 17, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER by MDL Panel TRANSFERRING CASE to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
September 18, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER by MDL Panel remanding case to the Northern District of California; Case reopened. (Attachments: # 1 District of PA Docket Sheet)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner et al v. General Electronic Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electronic Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Turner
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Represented By: Alan R. Brayton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Turner
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Represented By: Alan R. Brayton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Lee Turner
Represented By: Alan R. Brayton
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Turner
Represented By: Alan R. Brayton
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice M. King
Represented By: Alan R. Brayton
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]