Digital Reg of Texas, LLC v. Adobe Systems Incorporated et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Digital Reg of Texas, LLC
Defendant: Adobe Systems Incorporated, Valve Corporation, Electronic Arts Inc., Ubisoft, Inc., Symantec Corporation, AVG Technologies USA, Inc., Zynga Game Network Inc, Zynga, Inc. and Intuit Inc.
Mediator: James Knowles
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv01971
Filed: April 20, 2012
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2012 163 CLERKS NOTICE: Advising Counsel of receipt of case from USDC Eastern District of Texas. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
April 20, 2012 162 Featured Case ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/18/2012. Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2012 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/20/12. (Attachments: # 1 NC Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2012)
April 20, 2012 161 Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 6:11-cv-00305. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2012: # 2 Initial transferred documents) (aaa, COURT STAFF).
April 18, 2012 Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of California. (mll, )
March 28, 2012 This civil action will be transferred to the Northern District of California on or after 4-17-2012 per Local Rule CV-83(b). (mll, )
March 28, 2012 160 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 65 Motion to Change Venue to the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/27/12. cc:attys 3-28-12 (mll, )
March 26, 2012 159 REPLY to Response to Motion re 153 Opposed MOTION to Compel Compliance with P.R. 3-1, 152 Opposed MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions filed by Zynga, Inc. . (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Angel Mitchell)(Bunt, Robert)
March 15, 2012 158 RESPONSE in Opposition re 153 Opposed MOTION to Compel Compliance with P.R. 3-1, 152 Opposed MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions filed by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1 - 6751670 v Zynga Mobile Apps)(Albritton, Eric)
March 12, 2012 157 Featured Case ORDER granting 156 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines. The production of documents of Defendants Valve Corporation, Ubisoft, Inc., Symantec Corporation, and Intuit Inc., is now due 3-16-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/12/12. cc:attys 3-12-12(mll, )
March 9, 2012 156 STIPULATION re 151 Order JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC, Intuit Inc., Symantec Corporation, Ubisoft, Inc., Valve Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2012: # 2 Corrected Certificate of Service) (gsg, ).
March 1, 2012 155 Featured Case ORDER granting 149 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Angela D Mitchell terminated as counsel for deft Ubisoft Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/01/12. cc:attys 3-01-12 (mll, )
March 1, 2012 154 Featured Case ORDER granting 148 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lynn C Herndon terminated as counsel for deft Ubisoft Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/01/12. cc:attys 3-01-12 (mll, )
February 29, 2012 153 Opposed MOTION to Compel Compliance with P.R. 3-1 by Zynga, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Angel Mitchell, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E-1, # 7 Exhibit E-2, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
February 29, 2012 152 Opposed MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions by Zynga, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Angel Mitchell, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E-1, # 7 Exhibit E-2, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
February 27, 2012 151 Featured Case ORDER granting 147 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines. The production of documents previously due on 2-24-2012 is now due on 3-09-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/27/12. cc:attys 2-28-12(mll, )
February 27, 2012 150 NOTICE by AVG Technologies USA, Inc., Adobe Systems Incorporated, Electronic Arts, Inc., Intuit Inc., Symantec Corporation, Ubisoft, Inc., Valve Corporation, Zynga Game Network Inc., Zynga, Inc. [DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS PURSUANT TO P.L.R. 3-3 AND 3-4] (Mehta, Sonal)
February 27, 2012 149 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Angela D. Mitchell by Ubisoft, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Herndon, Lynn)
February 27, 2012 148 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Lynn C. Herndon by Ubisoft, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Herndon, Lynn)
February 24, 2012 147 STIPULATION [JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE] by AVG Technologies USA, Inc., Adobe Systems Incorporated, Digital Reg of Texas, LLC, Electronic Arts, Inc., Intuit Inc., Symantec Corporation, Ubisoft, Inc., Valve Corporation, Zynga Game Network Inc., Zynga, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal)
February 24, 2012 146 NOTICE by Ubisoft, Inc. NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AS TO ERIC BURESH (Bunt, Robert)
February 24, 2012 145 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michelle Lyons Marriott on behalf of Ubisoft, Inc. (Marriott, Michelle)
February 17, 2012 144 NOTICE by AVG Technologies USA, Inc., Adobe Systems Incorporated, Electronic Arts, Inc., Intuit Inc., Symantec Corporation, Ubisoft, Inc., Valve Corporation, Zynga Game Network Inc. re 65 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue (Reines, Edward)
February 7, 2012 143 DIGITAL REG OF TEXAS, LLC's ANSWER to 130 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by DEFENDANT INTUIT INC. by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC.(Price, Adam)
February 7, 2012 142 DIGITAL REG OF TEXAS, LLC's ANSWER to 129 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by DEFENDANT ELECTRONIC ARTS, INC. by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC.(Price, Adam)
February 7, 2012 141 DIGITAL REG OF TEXAS, LLC's ANSWER to 128 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by DEFENDANT ADOBE SYSTEMS INC. by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC.(Price, Adam)
February 7, 2012 140 DIGITAL REG OF TEXAS, LLC's ANSWER to 126 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by DEFENDANT AVG TECHNOLOGIES USA, INC. by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC.(Price, Adam)
February 7, 2012 139 DIGITAL REG OF TEXAS, LLC's ANSWER to 125 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by DEFENDAN ZYNGA, INC. by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC.(Price, Adam)
February 7, 2012 138 DIGITAL REG OF TEXAS, LLC's ANSWER to 124 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by DEFENDANT UBISOFT, INC. by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC.(Price, Adam)
February 3, 2012 137 DIGITAL REG OF TEXAS, LLCS ANSWER to 123 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by DEFENDANT VALVE CORPORATION by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC.(Price, Adam)
January 27, 2012 136 Featured Case ORDER granting re 135 Stipulation to Extend Certain Deadlines. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/27/12. cc:attys 1-27-12(mll, )
January 26, 2012 135 STIPULATION [JOINT STIPULATION AND MOTION TO EXTEND CERTAIN DEADLINES] by AVG Technologies USA, Inc., Adobe Systems Incorporated, Digital Reg of Texas, LLC, Electronic Arts, Inc., Intuit Inc., Symantec Corporation, Ubisoft, Inc., Valve Corporation, Zynga Game Network Inc., Zynga, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal)
January 23, 2012 134 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. James Knowles added as Mediator. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/23/12. cc:attys 1-24-12(mll, )
January 19, 2012 133 Featured Case ORDER granting 132 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline by which the parties are to submit the name and address of an agreed mediator or advise the Court if no agreement can be reached is extended to 2-01-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/19/12. cc:attys 1-20-12 (mll, )
January 18, 2012 132 Unopposed MOTION To Extend Time to Submit Mediator Disclosures by Valve Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
January 17, 2012 131 Symantec Corporation's ANSWER to 114 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Symantec Corporation.(Shanberg, Stefani)
January 17, 2012 130 ANSWER to 114 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Digital Reg of Texas, LLC by Intuit Inc..(Ribera, Hector)
January 17, 2012 129 DEFENDANT ELECTRONIC ART INC.'S ANSWER to 114 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Digital Reg of Texas, LLC by Electronic Arts, Inc..(Reines, Edward)
January 17, 2012 128 DEFENDANT ADOBE SYSTEMS INC.'S ANSWER to 114 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Digital Reg of Texas, LLC by Adobe Systems Incorporated.(Reines, Edward)
January 17, 2012 127 PLEASE IGNORE. Pleading filed in error. Atty re-filed document at DE 130. PLEASE IGNORE. INTUIT INC.'S ANSWER to 114 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Digital Reg of Texas, LLC by Intuit Inc..(Ribera, Hector) Modified on 1/18/2012 (leh, ).
January 17, 2012 126 ANSWER to 114 Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Digital Reg of Texas, LLC by AVG Technologies USA, Inc..(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
January 17, 2012 125 DEFENDANT ZYNGA'S ANSWER to 114 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Digital Reg of Texas, LLC by Zynga, Inc..(Bunt, Robert)
January 17, 2012 124 DEFENDANT UBISOFT'S ANSWER to 114 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Digital Reg of Texas, LLC by Ubisoft, Inc..(Bunt, Robert)
January 13, 2012 123 DEFENDANT VALVE CORPORATION's ANSWER to 114 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Digital Reg of Texas, LLC by Valve Corporation.(Smith, Melissa)
January 12, 2012 122 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** Defendant Value Corporation's ANSWER to 114 Amended Complaint by Valve Corporation.(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 1/13/2012 (mjc, ).
January 11, 2012 121 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Digital Reg of Texas, LLC (Hill, Jack)
January 11, 2012 120 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Digital Reg of Texas, LLC (Ward, Thomas)
January 10, 2012 119 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony H Cataldo, III on behalf of AVG Technologies USA, Inc. (Cataldo, Anthony)
January 5, 2012 118 NOTICE by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Electronic Arts, Inc. of Subpoena to produce documents to IBM Corporation (Mehta, Sonal)
January 4, 2012 117 Featured Case DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 9/14/2012; Respond to Amended Pleadings by 9-28-2012. Discovery due by 6/14/2013. Expert Witness List due by 4/26/2013; Rebuttal Expert Witnesses designated by 5-24-2013. Identify trial witnesses by 6/21/2013; Rebuttal Trial Witnesses identified by 7-01-2013. Joinder of Parties due by 1/27/2012, for defts. Jury instructions due by 10/20/2013. Mediation Completion due by 10/31/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 7/3/2013; Response to Dispositive Motions due 8-02-2013. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/20/2013. Jury Selection set for 1/6/2014 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 1/13/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 1/17/2013 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Expected Length of Trial 7 days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/04/12. cc:attys 1-05-12(mll, )
January 4, 2012 116 Featured Case DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/04/12. cc:attys 1-05-12(mll, )
January 3, 2012 115 REPLY to Response to Motion re 109 SEALED MOTION MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA filed by Intuit Inc.. (Ribera, Hector)
December 29, 2011 114 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(DiNovo, Andrew)
December 23, 2011 113 RESPONSE in Opposition re 109 SEALED MOTION MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA filed by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (DiNovo, Andrew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ).
December 21, 2011 112 Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Hector J. Ribera, # 2 Exhibit "A", # 3 Exhibit "B", # 4 Exhibit "C", # 5 Exhibit "D", # 6 Exhibit "E", # 7 Exhibit "F", # 8 Exhibit "G", # 9 Exhibit "H", # 10 Exhibit "I")(Ribera, Hector)
December 21, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 111 Sealed Motion. PLEASE IGNORE. DOCUMENT IS NOT A MOTION. TO BE REFILED USING CORRECT DOCKET EVENT.*** (mjc, )
December 21, 2011 111 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** SEALED MOTION Defendants' Supplemental Submission In Support of Motion To Transfer Venue To The Northern District of California by Intuit Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Hector Ribera, # 2 Exhibit "A", # 3 Exhibit "B", # 4 Exhibit "C", # 5 Exhibit "D", # 6 Exhibit "E", # 7 Exhibit "F", # 8 Exhibit "G", # 9 Exhibit "H", # 10 Exhibit "I", # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Ribera, Hector) Modified on 12/21/2011 (mjc, ).
December 21, 2011 110 Featured Case ORDER granting 108 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/21/11. cc:attys 12-21-11 (mll, )
December 20, 2011 109 SEALED MOTION MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Intuit Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" To The Motion For Leave To FIle Supplemental Submission, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ribera, Hector)
December 20, 2011 108 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Intuit Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ribera, Hector)
December 6, 2011 107 NOTICE by Symantec Corporation Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Smith, Ryan)
December 5, 2011 106 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Initial Disclosure (Albritton, Eric)
December 5, 2011 105 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Zynga, Inc. (NOTICE OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES) (Bunt, Robert)
December 5, 2011 104 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Ubisoft, Inc. (NOTICE OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES) (Bunt, Robert)
December 2, 2011 103 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by AVG Technologies USA, Inc. (Rousseau, Timothy)
December 2, 2011 102 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Intuit Inc. (Mewes, Heather)
December 2, 2011 101 NOTICE by Adobe Systems Incorporated NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Mehta, Sonal)
December 2, 2011 100 NOTICE by Electronic Arts, Inc. NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Mehta, Sonal)
December 2, 2011 99 NOTICE by Valve Corporation NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Smith, Melissa)
November 30, 2011 98 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam G Price on behalf of Digital Reg of Texas, LLC (Price, Adam)
November 11, 2011 97 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order and Discovery Order by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(DiNovo, Andrew)
November 8, 2011 96 Featured Case ORDER granting 95 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for the parties to submit their proposed docket control and discovery ordered is extended to 11-11-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/08/11. cc:attys 11-08-11 (mll, )
November 5, 2011 95 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew)
October 27, 2011 94 Featured Case ORDER granting 93 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for parties tosubmit their proposed docket control and discovery orders shall be 11-04-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/27/11. cc:attys 10-27-11 (mll, )
October 26, 2011 93 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control and Discovery Orders (Joint) by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Ryan)
October 19, 2011 92 Featured Case ORDER granting 91 Motion to Dismiss. Digitals claims against AVG Technologies USA Inc with respect to U.S. Patent No. 6,389,541 are herebydismissed with prejudice, and AVGs counterclaims against Digital are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs, expenses,and attorneys fees in connection with those claims. The remaining claims in this case between Digital and AVG shall continue unaffected by this Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/19/11. cc:attys 10-20-11 (mll, )
October 18, 2011 91 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Partial (as to U.S. Patent No. 6,389,541) by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(DiNovo, Andrew)
October 17, 2011 90 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 65 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue filed by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Valve Gearbox, # 2 Exhibit Valve Half Life, # 3 Exhibit Valve Ubisoft, # 4 Exhibit Valve Duke Nukem, # 5 Exhibit Bioware Austin)(DiNovo, Andrew)
October 14, 2011 89 Featured Case ORDER granting 86 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for parties to submit their proposed docket control and discovery orders is extended to 10-27-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/14/11. cc:attys 10-14-11 (mll, )
October 14, 2011 88 Featured Case ORDER granting 85 Motion to Dismiss. Digitals claims against Intuit Inc with respect to U.S. Patent No. 6,389,541 are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Intuits counterclaims against Digital with respect to U.S. Patent No. 6,389,541 are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneys fees in connection with those claims. The remaining claims in this case between Digital and Intuit shall continue unaffected by this Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/14/11. cc:attys 10-14-11 (mll, )
October 14, 2011 87 Featured Case ORDER granting 84 Motion to Dismiss. Digitals claims against Symantec Corporation with respect to U.S. Patent No. 6,389,541 are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneys fees in connection with such claims. Remaining claims in this case betweenDigital and Symantec shall continue unaffected by this Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/14/11. cc:attys 10-14-11 (mll, )
October 13, 2011 86 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control and Discovery Orders by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Ryan)
October 13, 2011 85 Joint MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) as to U.S. Patent No. 6,389,541 by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew)
October 13, 2011 84 Joint MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) as to U.S. Patent No. 6,389,541 by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew)
October 11, 2011 83 Featured Case ORDER granting 82 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/11/11. cc:attys 10-11-11 (mll, )
October 7, 2011 82 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew)
October 5, 2011 81 REPLY to Response to Motion re 65 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue (on behalf of all Defendants) filed by Ubisoft, Inc., Zynga, Inc. . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Russell Evans, # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Marie-Anne Boutet, # 3 Exhibit C - Declaration of David Majors)(Gorham, Andrew)
October 4, 2011 79 Featured Case ORDER that parties are to submit agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders to the Court by 10-17-2011. For purposes of computing the time deadlines under the local patent rules, the Court deems 10-17-2011 as the effective Rule 16 Initial Case Management Conference date, and thus plaintiff's PR 3-1 and 3-2 disclosures will be due 10-07-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/04/11. cc:attys 10-04-11(mll, )
October 4, 2011 78 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 76 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. DENIED as to the request to exceed page limits; GRANTED as to the extension of time to file a reply. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/04/11. cc:attys 10-04-11 (mll, )
October 3, 2011 80 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Status Conference held on 10/3/2011. (Court Reporter Jan Carter (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (mjm)
September 30, 2011 77 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Reed Thane on behalf of Adobe Systems Incorporated, Electronic Arts, Inc. (Thane, Joshua)
September 29, 2011 76 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and Extend Time to File Defendants' Reply to Motion to Transfer dkt # 65 (on behalf of all Defendants) by Ubisoft, Inc., Zynga, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
September 29, 2011 75 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen E Edwards on behalf of Digital Reg of Texas, LLC (Edwards, Stephen)
September 26, 2011 74 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marvin Craig Tyler on behalf of Symantec Corporation (Tyler, Marvin)
September 21, 2011 73 RESPONSE in Opposition re 65 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue (CORRECTED) filed by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jay D. Ellwanger in Support of Digital Reg of Texas LLC's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue, # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Michael R. Farley, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
September 21, 2011 72 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Thompson Gorham on behalf of Ubisoft, Inc., Zynga, Inc. (Gorham, Andrew)
September 20, 2011 71 RESPONSE in Opposition re 65 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue filed by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jay D. Ellwanger in Support of Digital Reg of Texas LLC's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue, # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Michael R. Farley, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
September 18, 2011 70 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of Adobe Systems Incorporated, Electronic Arts, Inc. (Doan, Jennifer)
September 15, 2011 69 Featured Case ORDER setting Status Conference for 10/3/2011 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/15/11. cc:attys 9-16-11(mll, )
August 23, 2011 68 Featured Case ORDER granting 67 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 65 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue; Responses due by 9/20/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/23/11. cc:attys 8-23-11 (mll, )
August 22, 2011 67 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 65 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
August 17, 2011 66 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 65 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-11)(Bunt, Robert)
August 17, 2011 65 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue by AVG Technologies USA, Inc., Adobe Systems Incorporated, Electronic Arts, Inc., Intuit Inc., Symantec Corporation, Ubisoft, Inc., Valve Corporation, Zynga Game Network Inc., Zynga, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Herndon Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A1, # 3 Exhibit A2, # 4 Exhibit A3, # 5 Exhibit A4, # 6 Exhibit A5, # 7 Exhibit A6, # 8 Exhibit A7, # 9 Exhibit A8, # 10 Exhibit A9, # 11 Exhibit A10, # 12 Exhibit A12, # 13 Exhibit A13, # 14 Exhibit B, # 15 Exhibit C, # 16 Exhibit D, # 17 Exhibit E, # 18 Exhibit F, # 19 Exhibit G, # 20 Exhibit H, # 21 Exhibit I, # 22 Exhibit J - Sowers Declaration, # 23 Exhibit J1, # 24 Exhibit J2, # 25 Exhibit J3, # 26 Exhibit J4, # 27 Exhibit J5, # 28 Exhibit J6, # 29 Exhibit J7, # 30 Exhibit J8, # 31 Exhibit J9, # 32 Exhibit J10, # 33 Exhibit J11, # 34 Exhibit J12, # 35 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
August 4, 2011 64 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 26 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Zynga Game Network, Inc. by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC.(Albritton, Eric)
August 4, 2011 63 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 28 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Ubisoft, Inc. by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC.(Albritton, Eric)
August 4, 2011 62 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 29 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Valve Corporation by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC.(Albritton, Eric)
August 4, 2011 61 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 33 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Intuit Inc. by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC.(Albritton, Eric)
August 4, 2011 60 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 38 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Adobe Systems Incorporated by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC.(Albritton, Eric)
August 4, 2011 59 Plaintiffs ANSWER to 24 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of 1.AVG Technologies USA, Inc. by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC.(Albritton, Eric)
August 4, 2011 58 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 40 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Electronic Arts, Inc. by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC.(Albritton, Eric)
July 27, 2011 57 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC identifying Corporate Parent DRM Technologies, L.L.C. for Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Albritton, Eric)
July 27, 2011 56 NOTICE by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC re 43 Order, Plaintiff's Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference (Albritton, Eric)
July 27, 2011 55 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ubisoft, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ubisoft Holdings, Inc. for Ubisoft, Inc.. (Bunt, Robert)
July 20, 2011 52 Featured Case ORDER granting 51 Motion to Substitute Defendant and Reform Caption. UbiSoft Entertainment, Inc. is substituted with Ubisoft, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/20/11. (mjc, )
July 19, 2011 54 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Angela D Mitchell for Ubisoft, Inc. and Angela D Mitchell for Zynga, Inc. Fee pd., 6-4146. Approved 7/19/11. (mjc, )
July 19, 2011 53 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lynn C Herndon for Ubisoft, Inc., Lynn C Herndon for Ubisoft, Inc., Lynn C Herndon for Zynga, Inc. Fee pd., 6-4146. Approved 7/19/11. (mjc, )
July 19, 2011 51 Unopposed MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE UBISOFT, INC. AS DEFENDANT FOR UBISOFT ENTERTAINMENT, INC. AND REFORM CAPTION by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew)
July 19, 2011 50 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eric A Buresh for UbiSoft Entertainment, Inc., Eric A Buresh for UbiSoft Entertainment, Inc., Eric A Buresh for Zynga, Inc., Eric A Buresh for Zynga, Inc. Receipt 6-4146. (gsg)
July 15, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 14 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Adobe Systems Incorporated to 7/14/2011. 3 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
July 15, 2011 49 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jay D Ellwanger on behalf of Digital Reg of Texas, LLC (Ellwanger, Jay)
July 15, 2011 48 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Raymond William Mort, III on behalf of Digital Reg of Texas, LLC (Mort, Raymond)
July 15, 2011 47 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Gerald DiNovo on behalf of Digital Reg of Texas, LLC (DiNovo, Andrew)
July 15, 2011 46 Return of Service Executed as to UbiSoft Entertainment, Inc. on 6/28/2011, by cert mail; answer due: 7/19/2011. (mll, )
July 15, 2011 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding 34 Symantec's Answer submitted by Symantec Corporation. Document does not contain a Certificate of Service. Please see corrected document 45 . (mjc, )
July 15, 2011 45 Defendant Symantec Corporation's ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Symantec Corporation.(Smith, Ryan)
July 15, 2011 44 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Symantec Corporation (Smith, Ryan)
July 15, 2011 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement submitted by Symantec Corporation. Document does not contain a Certificate of Service. Correction should be made by one business day. (mjc, )
July 14, 2011 43 Featured Case ORDER that plaintiff file a notice that the case is ready for scheduling conference when all of the defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice shall be filed within five days of the last remaining defendant's answer or motion. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/14/11. cc:attys 7-15-11(mll, )
July 14, 2011 42 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sonal N Mehta on behalf of Adobe Systems Incorporated, Electronic Arts, Inc. (Mehta, Sonal)
July 14, 2011 41 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Electronic Arts, Inc. (Reines, Edward)
July 14, 2011 40 Electronic Arts, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Digital Reg of Texas, LLC by Electronic Arts, Inc..(Reines, Edward)
July 14, 2011 39 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated (Reines, Edward)
July 14, 2011 38 Adobe Systems Incorporated's ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Digital Reg of Texas, LLC by Adobe Systems Incorporated.(Reines, Edward)
July 14, 2011 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward R Reines on behalf of Adobe Systems Incorporated, Electronic Arts, Inc. (Reines, Edward)
July 14, 2011 36 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Symantec Corporation (Smith, Ryan) Modified on 7/15/2011 (mjc, ).
July 14, 2011 35 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Intuit Inc. (Ribera, Hector)
July 14, 2011 34 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT 45 .***Defendant Symantec Corporation's ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Symantec Corporation.(Smith, Ryan) Modified on 7/15/2011 (mjc, ).
July 14, 2011 33 DEFENDANT INTUIT INC.'S ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Digital Reg of Texas, LLC by Intuit Inc..(Ribera, Hector)
July 14, 2011 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lauren Estelle Whittemore on behalf of Intuit Inc. (Whittemore, Lauren)
July 14, 2011 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Valve Corporation (Skok, Gavin)
July 14, 2011 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heather Nicole Mewes on behalf of Intuit Inc. (Mewes, Heather)
July 14, 2011 29 Valve Corporation's ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Digital Reg of Texas, LLC by Valve Corporation.(Skok, Gavin)
July 14, 2011 28 UbiSoft's ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Digital Reg of Texas, LLC by UbiSoft Entertainment, Inc..(Bunt, Robert)
July 14, 2011 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Zynga, Inc. (Bunt, Robert)
July 14, 2011 26 Zynga's ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Digital Reg of Texas, LLC by Zynga, Inc., Zynga Game Network Inc..(Bunt, Robert)
July 14, 2011 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AVG Technologies USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent AVG Technologies N.V. for AVG Technologies USA, Inc.. (Cornelius, William)
July 14, 2011 24 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Digital Reg of Texas, LLC by AVG Technologies USA, Inc..(Cornelius, William)
July 14, 2011 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Parker Ainsworth on behalf of AVG Technologies USA, Inc. (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
July 14, 2011 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas J Kline on behalf of AVG Technologies USA, Inc. (Kline, Douglas)
July 14, 2011 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William A Meunier on behalf of AVG Technologies USA, Inc. (Meunier, William)
July 14, 2011 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy J Rousseau on behalf of AVG Technologies USA, Inc. (Rousseau, Timothy)
July 13, 2011 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Valve Corporation (Smith, Melissa)
July 11, 2011 18 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Gavin W Skok for Valve Corporation. (mll, )
July 11, 2011 17 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Reynaldo C Barcelo for Valve Corporation. (mll, )
July 11, 2011 16 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bryan J Case for Valve Corporation. (mll, )
July 11, 2011 15 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jayson W Sowers for Valve Corporation. (mll, )
July 11, 2011 14 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Adobe Systems Incorporated.( Mehta, Sonal)
July 8, 2011 13 Return of Service Executed as to Adobe Systems Incorporated on 6/20/2011, by cert mail; answer due: 7/11/2011. (mll, )
July 8, 2011 12 Return of Service Executed as to Zynga Game Network Inc. on 6/24/2011, by cert mail; answer due: 7/15/2011. (mll, )
July 8, 2011 11 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ryan R Smith for Symantec Corporation. (mll, )
July 8, 2011 10 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Connie Choi for Symantec Corporation. (mll, )
July 7, 2011 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stefani E Shanberg on behalf of Symantec Corporation (Shanberg, Stefani)
June 30, 2011 8 Return of Service Executed as to AVG Technologies USA, Inc. on 6/23/2011, by cert mail; answer due: 7/14/2011. (mll, )
June 30, 2011 7 Return of Service Executed as to Electronic Arts, Inc. on 6/23/2011, by cert mail; answer due: 7/14/2011. (mll, )
June 30, 2011 6 Return of Service Executed as to Valve Corporation on 6/23/2011, by cert mail; answer due: 7/14/2011. (mll, )
June 30, 2011 5 Return of Service Executed as to Symantec Corporation on 6/23/2011, by cert mail; answer due: 7/14/2011. (mll, )
June 30, 2011 4 Return of Service Executed as to Intuit Inc. on 6/23/2011, by cert mail; answer due: 7/14/2011. (mll, )
June 30, 2011 3 Return of Service Executed as to Zynga, Inc. on 6/23/2011, by cert mail; answer due: 7/14/2011. (mll, )
June 17, 2011 2 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to AVG Technologies USA, Inc., Adobe Systems Incorporated, Electronic Arts, Inc., Intuit Inc., Symantec Corporation, UbiSoft Entertainment, Inc., Valve Corporation, Zynga Game Network Inc., Zynga, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es), # 3 Summons(es), # 4 Summons(es), # 5 Summons(es), # 6 Summons(es), # 7 Summons(es), # 8 Summons(es))(kls, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/20/2011: # 2 Electronic Arts Summons) (kls, ). Modified on 6/20/2011 (kls, ).
June 15, 2011 Judge Leonard Davis added. (mjc, )
June 14, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against AVG Technologies USA, Inc., Adobe Systems Incorporated, Electronic Arts, Inc., Symantec Corporation, UbiSoft Entertainment, Inc., Valve Corporation, Zynga Game Network Inc., Zynga, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3078865.), filed by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Albritton, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Digital Reg of Texas, LLC v. Adobe Systems Incorporated et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Digital Reg of Texas, LLC
Represented By: Adam G Price
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr.
Represented By: Raymond William Mort, III
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Represented By: Jay D Ellwanger
Represented By: Stephen E. Edwards
Represented By: Andrew Gerald DiNovo
Represented By: Eric M. Albritton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adobe Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Edward Robert Reines
Represented By: Sonal N. Mehta
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: Joshua Reed Thane
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valve Corporation
Represented By: Reynaldo C Barcelo
Represented By: Bryan J Case
Represented By: Gavin W Skok
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Jayson W Sowers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electronic Arts Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: Sonal N. Mehta
Represented By: Edward Robert Reines
Represented By: Joshua Reed Thane
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ubisoft, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Eric A. Buresh
Represented By: Andrew Thompson Gorham
Represented By: Michelle Lyons Marriott
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symantec Corporation
Represented By: Connie Choi
Represented By: Stefani E Shanberg
Represented By: Ryan R. Smith
Represented By: Marvin Craig Tyler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVG Technologies USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Represented By: Anthony H Cataldo, III
Represented By: William Joseph Cornelius, Jr
Represented By: Douglas J. Kline
Represented By: William A. Meunier
Represented By: Timothy J. Rousseau
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zynga Game Network Inc
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zynga, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Eric A. Buresh
Represented By: Andrew Thompson Gorham
Represented By: Angela Dawn Mitchell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intuit Inc.
Represented By: Heather Nicole Mewes
Represented By: Hector Ribera
Represented By: Lauren Estelle Whittemore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: James Knowles
Represented By: James W Knowles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]