JBR, Inc v. Cafe Don Paco, Inc et al

Defendant: Alavaro Montealgre, Roberto Bendana and Cafe Don Paco, Inc
Plaintiff: JBR, Inc
Case Number: 3:2012cv02377
Filed: May 10, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING Initial Case Management Conference to 3/13/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Joint case management statement due 3/6/2013. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/8/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
May 6, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE AND EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE 24 25 27 . Further Case Management Conference set for 8/7/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/6/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
September 19, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE MOTION TO CONTINUE 37 . Further Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 9/19/103. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
December 13, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING RE DKT. NO. 48: Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment 40 and Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/13/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
June 6, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE and for Further Briefing. Show Cause Response due by 6/20/2014. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on June 6, 2014. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
July 10, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on July 10, 2014. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
July 29, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 8/5/2014. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on July 29, 2014. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
August 12, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on August 12, 2014. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JBR, Inc v. Cafe Don Paco, Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alavaro Montealgre
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberto Bendana
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cafe Don Paco, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JBR, Inc
Represented By: Paul Joseph Smoot
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]