J.K. v. San Rafael City Schools

Plaintiff: J.K.
Defendant: San Rafael City Schools
Case Number: 3:2012cv02563
Filed: May 18, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM re 8 Proposed Order filed by J.K. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/20/12. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
November 29, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to reschedule settlement conference filed by J.K. Settlement Conference set for 12/17/2012 11:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/29/12. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2012)
January 24, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/24/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
June 19, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/19/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
June 25, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/23/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/30/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/25/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.K. v. San Rafael City Schools
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.K.
Represented By: Margaret Mary Broussard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Rafael City Schools
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]