United States of America v. $237,632.29 In Funds Seized From Bank of America Acct #XXXXX52266 et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $237,632.29 In Funds Seized From Bank of America Acct #XXXXX52266 and $60,435.65 In Funds Seized From JPMorgan Chase Acct #XXXX26654
Claimant: Citi Alliance Telecard Inc
Case Number: 3:2012cv04416
Filed: August 22, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 11 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/26/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
October 3, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 18 Case Management Statement filed by Citi Alliance Telecard Inc. MOTION DUE BY 10/08/2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012)
October 31, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING re 20 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice filed by Citi Alliance Telecard Inc (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2012)
November 19, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING CLAIMANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FRCP 41(a)(2) AND TO GRANT ATTORNEY'S FEES by Judge William Alsup [denying 20 Motion to Dismiss]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $237,632.29 In Funds Seized From Bank of America Acct #XXXXX52266 et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Arvon Jacque Perteet
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $237,632.29 In Funds Seized From Bank of America Acct #XXXXX52266
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $60,435.65 In Funds Seized From JPMorgan Chase Acct #XXXX26654
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Citi Alliance Telecard Inc
Represented By: Jacob P. Alpren
Represented By: David C. Brownstein
Represented By: William S Farmer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]