Asetek Holdings, Inc et al v. Coolit Systems Inc

Plaintiff: Asetek A/S and Asetek Holdings, Inc
Defendant: Coolit Systems Inc
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv04498
Filed: August 27, 2012
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 3, 2013 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 114 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Defendant Coolit Systems, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Supporting Coolit's Reply Re Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Coolit Systems Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/3/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
October 3, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASES. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2012. Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2012 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on October 3, 2012. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012)
September 9, 2013 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ***Deadlines terminated. 120 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 120 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request to Seal Courtroom During Summary Judgment Hearing; Proposed Order filed by Asetek Holdings, Inc, Asetek A/S, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 120 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request to Seal Courtroom During Summary Judgment Hearing; Proposed Order, 93 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment PUBLIC VERSION. Motion Hearing reset for 9/19/2013 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/9/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
October 2, 2013 131 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 130 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Order Changing Time to File Responsive and Reply Claim Construction Briefs filed by Coolit Systems Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/2/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
October 11, 2013 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying in Part and Deferring in Part 93 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 18, 2013 140 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 139 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation Regarding Plaintiffs' Claim Construction Reply Brief Page Limit; Proposed Order filed by Asetek Holdings, Inc, Asetek A/S. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/18/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 22, 2013 144 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 142 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request for Order Extending Time to File Reply Claim Construction Briefs by 9:00 a.m. on 10/29/13 filed by Asetek Holdings, Inc, Asetek A/S. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/22/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
October 29, 2013 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 145 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request to Modify the Partial Summary Judgment Supplemental Discovery and Briefing Schedule filed by Asetek Holdings, Inc, Asetek A/S. Supplemental Discovery due 12/16/2013. Supplemental Brief due by 12/23/2013. Responsive Brief due by 1/6/2014. Signed by Judge Edward M Chen on 10/28/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
November 21, 2013 152 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 151 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER RE MATERIALS FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION TUTORIAL filed by Coolit Systems Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/21/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
December 3, 2013 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Claim Construction for Asetek's Patents. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/3/2013. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
December 3, 2013 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Claim Construction for CoolIT's Patent. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/3/2013. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
April 9, 2014 171 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 170 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Discovery Deadline filed by Asetek Holdings, Inc, Asetek A/S. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/9/14. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
April 17, 2014 173 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 172 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Discovery Deadline filed by Asetek Holdings, Inc, Asetek A/S Discovery due by 4/21/2014.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/17/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
May 30, 2014 187 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 186 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER RE MATERIALS FOR MOTION HEARING filed by Coolit Systems Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/30/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2014)
June 16, 2014 193 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 191 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Exceed Page Limit for Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Asetek Holdings, Inc, Asetek A/S. Modified - 30 pages only. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/16/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
June 16, 2014 194 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part 93 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/16/2014. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
October 24, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/24/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2012)
August 19, 2014 232 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - PUBLIC & REDACTED ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 195 200 Defendant's and Plaintiffs' Motions for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2014)
November 8, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 22 MOTION to Dismiss 20 MOTION to Stay Pending Outcome of Inter Partes Reexaminations filed by Asetek Holdings, Inc, Responses due by 11/23/2012. Replies due by 12/7/2012.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/8/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
November 29, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESETTING CMC TO 1/17/13 AT 1:30 P.M. re 38 Notice (Other) filed by Coolit Systems Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/29/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2012)
January 16, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 55 Stipulated Request to Seal Courtroom During Motions Hearing; [Proposed] Order filed by Asetek Holdings, Inc, Asetek A/S. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/16/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
January 23, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 52 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply; denying 20 Defendant's Motion to Stay (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
January 23, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (REDACTED VERSION) by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 22 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
January 25, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (REDACTED VERSION) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS . Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/23/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2013) Modified on 1/25/2013 (bpf, COURT STAFF).
February 1, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDNANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS (Narrower redacted version of Order #62). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/23/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
February 8, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulated Protective Order filed by Asetek Holdings, Inc, Asetek A/S. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/8/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
March 12, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 73 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER AMENDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; PROPOSED ORDER filed by Coolit Systems Inc Claims Construction Hearing set for 11/4/2013 02:30 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 10/21/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing set for 11/5/2013 02:30 PM.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/12/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
May 16, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 79 Stipulated Request to Seal Courtroom During Case Management Conference; [Proposed] Order filed by Asetek Holdings, Inc, Asetek A/S. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/16/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
June 19, 2013 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 86 Notice (Other) filed by Coolit Systems Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/19/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
September 24, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/24/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
August 13, 2013 98 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 97 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 93 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment PUBLIC VERSION Stipulated Request for Order Changing Time to Respond to Defendant CoolIT Systems Inc.'s Motion for Par tial Summary Judgment [Dkt. No. 93]</i filed by Asetek Holdings, Inc, Asetek A/S, Responses due by 8/23/2013. Replies due by 8/30/2013. Hearing set for 9/19/13. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/13/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Asetek Holdings, Inc et al v. Coolit Systems Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asetek A/S
Represented By: Robert Francis McCauley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asetek Holdings, Inc
Represented By: Robert Francis McCauley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coolit Systems Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]