Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC v. Bridgestone Americas, Inc. et al

Defendant: Bridgestone Americas, Inc. and Wildcat Creek, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv04753
Filed: September 11, 2012
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Referring Judge: Laurel Beeler
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding 5 Plaintiff's ex parte motion for expedited discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/5/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
March 8, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 34 Stipulation filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/7/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2013)
May 28, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Reset Deadlines as to 44 MOTION to Dismiss Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC's First Amended Complaint</i. Responses due by 7/9/2013. Replies due by 7/26/2013. Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/23/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
September 20, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/20/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC v. Bridgestone Americas, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgestone Americas, Inc.
Represented By: Carrie Lynn Bonnington
Represented By: Kirke M. Hasson
Represented By: Colin T. Kemp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wildcat Creek, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC
Represented By: Holly Gaudreau
Represented By: Timothy R. Cahn
Represented By: James G. Gilliland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]