UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Sato

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and Nicholas Brunetti
Respondent: Ken Sato
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv04916
Filed: September 20, 2012
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 29, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson adopting 8 Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation to grant petition to enforce IRS summons. Government to file proposed order by 02/05/13. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
January 31, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ENFORCING SUMMONS. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/30/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/31/2013: # 1 Exhibit A) (tmi, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/14/2012 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/1/12. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
December 26, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/26/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Sato
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Thomas Moore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Brunetti
Represented By: Thomas Moore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ken Sato
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]