Puruganan et al v. HSBC Bank USA, National Association et al

Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, National Association and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc
Plaintiff: Ernesto S. Puruganan and Isabelita Puruganan
Case Number: 3:2012cv05168
Filed: October 5, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken for Judge SAUNDRA BROWN ARMSTRONG on 10/10/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2012)
October 10, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge WILKEN FOR JUDGE ARMSTRONG denying 2 Motion for TRO (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2012)
November 13, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 14 Motion for TRO (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
December 19, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/18/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
January 4, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG terminating 21 Motion to Dismiss (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Puruganan et al v. HSBC Bank USA, National Association et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, National Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernesto S. Puruganan
Represented By: Christopher Paul Epsha
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabelita Puruganan
Represented By: Christopher Paul Epsha
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]