Electronic Frontier Foundation v. Department of Homeland Security

Plaintiff: Electronic Frontier Foundation
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv05580
Filed: October 30, 2012
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
 
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2012 10 Featured Case ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/4/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
December 13, 2012 11 Featured Case ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/28/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/13/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
January 29, 2013 14 Featured Case AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/14/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/29/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
March 31, 2014 36 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion for Summary Judgment (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
April 29, 2014 38 Featured Case ORDER re 37 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Department of Homeland Security, Electronic Frontier Foundation. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/29/14. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Electronic Frontier Foundation v. Department of Homeland Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electronic Frontier Foundation
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Lynch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Jennie Leah Kneedler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]