Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Thompson et al

Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Robert Thompson and Virginia Thompson
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv05634
Filed: November 2, 2012
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
 
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1443(1) Rent, Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2013 11 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 5 MOTION to Remand to Superior Court filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Objections due by 1/25/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/10/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2013: # 1 Proof of Service) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2013 12 Featured Case REASSIGNMENT ORDER re 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 5 MOTION to Remand to Superior Court filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/10/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2013: # 1 Proof of Service) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2013 15 Featured Case JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
February 20, 2013 16 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND REMANDING THE ACTION TO ALAMEDA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT 5 13 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/20/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/20/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tfS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Thompson et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Tracey Lynn Merrell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]