Rivers v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation

Plaintiff: Joseph Rivers
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 3:2012cv06157
Filed: December 5, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 25 STIPULATION RE: REASSIGMENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE CORLEY FOR ALL PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/19/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
May 6, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/6/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
January 7, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/7/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivers v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Rivers
Represented By: Rachael Michelle Langston
Represented By: Jinny Kim
Represented By: Claudia Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: L. Julius M. Turman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.