Heller Ehrman LLP et al

Creditor: Iris Biotechnologies, Inc
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv06232
Filed: December 7, 2012
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
 
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BAP)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/1/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
May 15, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO STRIKE re 13 MOTION to Strike 12 Appellant's Reply Brief. Appellant's opposition due by 5/24/2013.Respondent may file a reply by 5/31/2013. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 05/15/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
August 12, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON 1 Bankruptcy Appeal - Affirming Bankruptcy Court - and GRANTING 13 Motion to Strike.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 12, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
September 30, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 25 Notice of Change In Counsel. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/30/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
February 6, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 6, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
February 7, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/7/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Heller Ehrman LLP et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Creditor: Iris Biotechnologies, Inc
Represented By: Daniel R. Sterrett
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]