Cooney v. California Public Utilities Commission et al

Defendant: Itron, Inc., San Diego Gas & Electric (SDG&E), State of California, California Public Utilities Commission and Michael R. Peevey
Plaintiff: Deborah Cooney
Case Number: 3:2012cv06466
Filed: December 20, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONDITIONALLY GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 10 MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/1/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
September 10, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING PLAINTIFFS ( 10 , 12 ) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
October 4, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Wilken granting in part 35 Motion to Continue (cwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
October 30, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS 43 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013) Modified on 10/30/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING DEFENDANTS ( 26 , 28 MOTIONS TO DISMISS. (Granting 36 Motion to Dismiss) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2014)
September 15, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS 57 MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND DISMISSING CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT SAN DIEGO GAS AND ELECTRIC. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
September 15, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of San Diego Gas & Electric (SDG&E) against Deborah Cooney. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
November 26, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING PLAINTIFFS 63 MOTION TO ALTER OR AMEND THE JUDGMENT AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 26, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/26/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooney v. California Public Utilities Commission et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Itron, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego Gas & Electric (SDG&E)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Public Utilities Commission
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R. Peevey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Cooney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]