Internet Patents Corporation v. Quinstreet, Inc.

Defendant: Quinstreet, Inc.
Plaintiff: Internet Patents Corporation
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv06506
Filed: December 21, 2012
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/27/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
September 24, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 24, 2013. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
October 25, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/25/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Internet Patents Corporation v. Quinstreet, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quinstreet, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Internet Patents Corporation
Represented By: Brian Lawrence King
Represented By: Michael Pierre Adams
Represented By: L. Eric Loewe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]