Fox Partners, L.P. v. Grand Home Holdings, Inc. et al

Defendant: Grand Home Enterprise, Co Ltd. and Grand Home Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Fox Partners, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00221
Filed: January 16, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/13/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
March 25, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Motion for Writ of Attachment. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 3/25/2013. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013) Modified on 3/25/2013 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 36 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/22/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fox Partners, L.P. v. Grand Home Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Home Enterprise, Co Ltd.
Represented By: Joshua David Brysk
Represented By: James Gerald Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Home Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: James Gerald Schwartz
Represented By: Joshua David Brysk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fox Partners, L.P.
Represented By: Lewis Russell Warren
Represented By: Bryan Coryell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.