Hewlett v. Elder-Hoskins et al

Appellee: Lombard Street Employees Plan, Regulo Cubillos Sierra, Prudential California Realty, Charlene Delaney Real Estate, Inc. and Janina Maria Elder-Hoskins
Miscellaneous: Thomas E. Carlson and USBC Manager-San Francisco
Appellant: Patricia Isabelle Hewlett
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00328
Filed: January 23, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
 
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BAP)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 8, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER, granting 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 9 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief filed by Patricia Isabelle Hewlett. Appellant's Opening Brief due by 6/7/2013. Appellee's Response Brief due by 7/15/2013. Appellant's Reply Brief due by 7/31/2013. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/8/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
September 16, 2013 20 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/16/2013. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
March 4, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hewlett v. Elder-Hoskins et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Lombard Street Employees Plan
Represented By: David Mark Parker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Regulo Cubillos Sierra
Represented By: P. Kurt Peterson
Represented By: Cary Dov McReynolds
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Prudential California Realty
Represented By: P. Kurt Peterson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Charlene Delaney Real Estate, Inc.
Represented By: P. Kurt Peterson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Janina Maria Elder-Hoskins
Represented By: Nhung Le
Represented By: Michael Alan Isaacs
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Fillerup
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Thomas E. Carlson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: USBC Manager-San Francisco
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Patricia Isabelle Hewlett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]