Neal v. NYK Line et al

Defendant: NYK Line and M/V Jupiter Leader
Plaintiff: Kenneth Neal
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00507
Filed: February 5, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
 
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/30/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
December 3, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/16/2013 02:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 12/9/2013. Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/3/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
January 9, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER ENLARGING PLAINTIFF'S PAGE LIMIT re 38 Stipulation, filed by Kenneth Neal, Topaz Sea Carriers PTE LTD, Anthony Leon Manning, Teddy Carl Freij, 37 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Separate Statement of Disputed Facts filed by Kenneth Neal, Anthony Leon Manning, Teddy Carl Freij. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/9/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
January 21, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING. The January 28, 2014 at 2:00pm Motion Hearing is VACATED. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/21/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
April 30, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE AND PROHIBITING FURTHER EXTENSIONS WITHOUT COURT ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/30/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
May 28, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING AND PRETRIAL ORDER AND REVISED PRETRIAL SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/28/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
July 7, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING DATES, SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING AND DENYING AS MOOT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ***Deadlines terminated. 58 Notice (Other) filed by Topaz Sea Carriers PTE LTD., Motions terminated: denying as moot 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Topaz Sea Carriers PTE LTD. Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 9/12/2014 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/7/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Neal v. NYK Line et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYK Line
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Jupiter Leader
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Neal
Represented By: Edward M. Bull, III
Represented By: Amy Jo Bull
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]