California Pacific Regional Medical Center v. Global Excel Management, Inc

Plaintiff: California Pacific Regional Medical Center
Defendant: Global Excel Management, Inc
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00540
Filed: February 7, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Request to Appear by Telephone 12 at Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact the Courtroom Deputy at 415.522.2039 to provide a telephone number for this appearance. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/22/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
April 30, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION 16 . Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/12/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Case management statement due 6/5/2013. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/30/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
June 4, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS 5 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: California Pacific Regional Medical Center v. Global Excel Management, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Pacific Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Melanie Joy Young
Represented By: Barry Sullivan
Represented By: Karlene Jasmine Rogers-Aberman
Represented By: Richard Alan Lovich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Excel Management, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]