GE Capital Information Technology Solution Inc. v. Carol H. Williams Advertising

Defendant: Carol H. Williams Advertising
Plaintiff: GE Capital Information Technology Solution Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00606
Filed: February 12, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 18 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
January 7, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 25 STIPULATION REMANDING CASE. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 1/7/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
March 4, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/4/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GE Capital Information Technology Solution Inc. v. Carol H. Williams Advertising
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol H. Williams Advertising
Represented By: S. Raye Mitchell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GE Capital Information Technology Solution Inc.
Represented By: Pamela Lorraine Cox
Represented By: Martina Anne Rider
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]