LEGG, LLC v. Unni

Defendant: Sanjay Unni
Plaintiff: LEGG, LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv00639
Filed: February 13, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/14/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 26, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge EDWARD M. CHEN on 3/26/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
August 2, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. STIPULATION AND ORDER re 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR REFERRAL OF CASE TO COURT MEDIATION UNDER ADR LOCAL RULE 6 filed by LECG, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/2/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
September 5, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Production, Exchange and Filing of Confidential Information filed by Sanjay Unni. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/5/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
November 22, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 43 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CHANGE THE DECEMBER 12, 2013 STATUS CONFERENCE DATE TO DECEMBER 5, 2013 filed by LECG, LLC Status Report due by 12/12/2013. Status Conference reset for 12/19/2013 10:30 AM before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/22/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
January 10, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 47 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR PRODUCTION, EXCHNAGE AND FILING OF HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION filed by LECG, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/10/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
February 21, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESETTING CERTAIN DATES AND EXTEND DISCOVERY re 51 Stipulation filed by Sanjay Unni Dispositive Motion Hearing reset for 5/15/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/21/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
May 23, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 59 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; and Denying 57 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
July 25, 2014 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 83 Defendant's Motion to Stay Execution of Judgment Through Appeal and Approval of Proposed Supersedeas Bond (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEGG, LLC v. Unni
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanjay Unni
Represented By: Dean Arthur Dickie
Represented By: George Leo Hampton, IV
Represented By: Colin Christopher Holley
Represented By: Kathleen Elizabeth Koppenhoefer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEGG, LLC
Represented By: Mark A. Johnston
Represented By: Mark A. Delgado
Represented By: Edward Noonan
Represented By: Sarah Shyr
Represented By: Michael Stanton Ward
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]