Global Allies, LLC v. Charter Furniture Corp.

Defendant: Charter Furniture Corp. and Lodging By Liberty
Plaintiff: Global Allies, LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00651
Filed: February 13, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Initial Disclosures re 28 Stipulation filed by Lodging By Liberty, Charter Furniture Corp. Plaintiff Global Allies, LLC and Defendants Charter Furniture Corp. and Lodging By Liberty, Inc. hereby stipulate, at the request of Defendants, to extend the date for the exchange of the parties' Initial Disclosures from July 5, 2013 to July 9, 2013. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/8/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
January 30, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Interim Case Management Conference is CONTINUED to 2/21/2014 at 10:00 a.m. On or before 2/14/2014, the parties shall file an updated Joint Interim Case Management Conference which provides an update on the status of the impending settlement. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/30/2014. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
March 1, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Edward J. Davila. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/1/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Global Allies, LLC v. Charter Furniture Corp.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Furniture Corp.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lodging By Liberty
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Allies, LLC
Represented By: Spencer Hosie
Represented By: Darrell Rae Atkinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]