Schafer et al v. Association for Small, Closely Held Businesses et al

Defendant: Association for Small, Closely Held Businesses, Kenneth Fehl, Ellen A Cronin, Clark Langrall, Jr. and Cronin Insurance Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brent Schafer and Todd Construction, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00659
Filed: February 14, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/22/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
March 25, 2013 16 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 15 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
April 19, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Initial Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines filed by Todd Construction, Inc., Brent Schafer]. Case Management Statement due by 5/23/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.There will be no further continuances. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/19/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
April 23, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT LANGRALL by Hon. William Alsup granting 21 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
May 30, 2013 34 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT ELLEN CRONIN by Hon. William Alsup granting 30 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
June 11, 2013 38 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT FEHL by Judge Alsup granting 37 Stipulation; finding as moot 33 Motion to Dismiss (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
August 5, 2013 42 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hon. William Alsup granting 40 Motion for Leave to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
September 4, 2013 48 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING ANDERSON SUBSTITUTION by Hon. William Alsup granting 45 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
September 4, 2013 49 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION by Hon. William Alsup granting 47 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
November 1, 2013 52 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting 51 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
December 3, 2013 53 Featured Case ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/3/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
January 27, 2014 56 Featured Case ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO DISMISS REMAINING DEFENDANTS PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT, Motions terminated: 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 43 Amended Complaint, Joint Stipulation To Dismiss Remaining Defendants With Prejudice Pursuant To Settlement Agreement filed by Todd Construction, Inc., Brent Schafer.. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 27, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Schafer et al v. Association for Small, Closely Held Businesses et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Association for Small, Closely Held Businesses
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Fehl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen A Cronin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark Langrall, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cronin Insurance Services, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Schafer
Represented By: Clifford Scott Davidson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Clifford Scott Davidson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]