Clockware, Inc. v. Sethy et al

Defendant: Sanat Kumar Sethy, Geetup, Inc. and Geetup Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Clockware, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00672
Filed: February 14, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 12 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER AND CONTINUING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 6/14/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/13/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
June 13, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 14 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER AND CONTINUING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 8/23/2013. Case Management Conference set for 8/30/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 13, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013)
August 26, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 17 Stipulation to Continue the Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 10/4/2013. Case Management Conference set for 10/11/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 26, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
September 25, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 19 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER AND CONTINUING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2013. Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/25/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
December 10, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 22 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 3/7/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/14/2014 01:30 PM.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 12/10/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
February 19, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/19/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clockware, Inc. v. Sethy et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanat Kumar Sethy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geetup, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geetup Systems, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clockware, Inc.
Represented By: Arman Javid, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]