Pizza v. Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc.,

Plaintiff: Daniel Pizza
Defendant: Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00688
Filed: February 14, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2013 13 Featured Case ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 1, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
April 19, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURTS STANDING ORDERS Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 19, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
May 6, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS. The parties shall participate in mediation; the deadline to complete mediation is 90 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 6, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
May 6, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; AFFORDING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; VACATING HEARING. The complaint is dismissed, with leave to amend. Pizza's amended complaint , if any, shall be filed no later than May 27, 2013. The Case Management Conference is continued from May 24, 2013 to July 12, 2013. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than July 5, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 6, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
July 3, 2013 32 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE EARLY MEDIATION DEADLINE. The deadline for the parties to complete mediation is extended to October 4, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 3, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
July 16, 2013 38 Featured Case PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 7/16/13. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
November 15, 2013 43 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY AND DISPOSITIVE MOTION DEADLINES. The discovery cut-off is extended to December 13, 2013, and the deadline to file a discovery motion is extended to December 13, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 15, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
December 13, 2013 46 Featured Case AMENDED PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Non-expert discovery cutoff is December 13, 2013, with the exception that deadline to conduct depositions is January 31, 2014. Expert discovery cutoff is April 28, 2014. Discovery motion filing deadline a nd dispositive motion filing deadline is February 11, 2014. Court trial (5 day estimate) set for August 25, 2014. Pretrial Conference set for August 12, 2014. Meet and confer deadline is June 27, 2014. Further Status Conference set for June 6, 2014; joint status conference statement due by May 30, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 13, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
April 30, 2014 64 Featured Case ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE. In light of the Court's unavailability on June 6, 2014, the Further Status Conference is continued to June 20, 2014, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than June 13, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 30, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
May 30, 2014 65 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. FINRA is entitled to judgment in its favor on Pizza's claim for breach of fiduciary duty. FINRA is entitled to judgment in its favor on Pizza' ;s retaliation claim to the extent the claim is based on (a) FINRA's directives that he sell securities issued by Citigroup and Merrill Lynch, and forfeit $905.30 in profits earned by selling securities issued by Deutsche Bank, and (b) cons tructive termination of his employment. FINRA is not entitled to judgment in its favor on Pizza's retaliation claim to the extent the claim is based on FINRA's not having allowed Pizza to participate in the lottery selection process for the Mentoring Circles Program. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 30, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2014)
August 20, 2014 87 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 20, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
March 26, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/26/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pizza v. Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc.,
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Pizza
Represented By: Michael Robert White
Represented By: John R. Strawn
Represented By: James Steven Reed
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]