Allegheny Casualty Company v. Legg, Inc et al

Defendant: Legg, Inc, Robert Legg, Sheila Legg, Leonard D'Orazio, Christine D'Orazio and The D'Orazio Family Trust
Plaintiff: Allegheny Casualty Company
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00697
Filed: February 15, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2013 11 Featured Case ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/5/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
March 5, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER AS MODIFIED; SETTING HEARING ON THE APPLICATION for Writ of Attachment or, in the Alternative, Temporary Protective Order. Plaintiff shall serve the Ex Parte Application for Writ of Attachement on ALL defen dants by 5:00 p.m. on 3/5/2013. Responses due by 3/11/2013. Replies due by 3/15/2013. Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/5/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
March 26, 2013 34 Featured Case RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 03/26/2013. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
November 15, 2013 45 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 15, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Allegheny Casualty Company v. Legg, Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legg, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Legg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila Legg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard D'Orazio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine D'Orazio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The D'Orazio Family Trust
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allegheny Casualty Company
Represented By: Andrew Joel Van Ornum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]