Doe v. Washington Township Healthcare District et al

Defendant: Jon Quianzon, Washington Township Healthcare District and Washington Hospital
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00745
Filed: February 20, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 10, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 22 STIPULATION Selecting Private ADR. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/10/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
June 24, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Hon. Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/24/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
October 28, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 37 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Discovery (First Request) filed by Jane Doe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/28/2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
December 20, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 39 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Discovery (Second Request) filed by Jane Doe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/20/2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
March 21, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 41 Dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/21/2014. The clerk shall close the file. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Doe v. Washington Township Healthcare District et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Quianzon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Township Healthcare District
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Hospital
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Jason Oliver Runckel
Represented By: William Daniel O'Malley
Represented By: Thomas Martin O'Connor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]