Softvault Systems, Inc v. Motive, Inc.

Plaintiff: Softvault Systems, Inc
Defendant: Motive, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00751
Filed: February 20, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting extension of time for case management conference. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 10/10/2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
November 14, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 11/14/2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
March 13, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED RELATED CASE ORDER (correcting case number from 13-cv-00750 to 13-cv-00754). Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/13/13. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Softvault Systems, Inc v. Motive, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Softvault Systems, Inc
Represented By: P.J. Benedict O'Mahoney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motive, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]