Lau v. Wong

Plaintiff: Karen Lau
Defendant: Eric Wong
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00763
Filed: February 21, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADDRESSING PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO 5 DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS. Responses due by 3/27/2013. Replies due by 4/3/2013. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/20/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 28, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 13 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONTINUE DEADLINES RELATED TO MOTION TO DISMISS. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
April 2, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT and ORDER regarding Defendant's motion to dismiss. Judge Wilken previously ordered that Plaintiff may have until May 6, 2013 to file an opposition to 5 Defendant's motion to dismiss and that Defendant shall file a reply seven days after Plaintiff files her opposition. 3/28/2013 Order, ECF No. 16. These briefing deadlines remain in effect. In addition, the court will hear oral argument on 5 Defendant's motion to dismiss at 9:30 a.m. on June 6, 2013 in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, United States District Court, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, California, 94102. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler.. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/2/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
May 20, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 5 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. The court GRANTS Defendant's motion to dismiss. Her claims, which arise either under Title VII or the FTCA, are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk of the Court shall close the file. Should Ms. Lau exhaust her administrative remedies within the time allowed, she may file a new action. The June 6, 2013 motion hearing is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 5/20/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/20/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ls, COURT STAFF).
March 13, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Claudia Wilken. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/13/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lau v. Wong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Lau
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Wong
Represented By: Ann Marie Reding
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]