Schwarzer v. UFCW-Northern California Employer's Joint Pension Plan

Defendant: UFCW-Northern California Employer's Joint Pension Plan
Plaintiff: William Schwarz
Case Number: 3:2013cv00977
Filed: March 4, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1131
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 21 DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 9/26/2013.(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
October 31, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE FOR 27 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Replies due by 12/16/2013. The court CONTINUES the hearing on Defendants' motion for summary judgment from December 19, 2013 to Ja nuary 16, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, United States District Court, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, California, 94102. Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/31/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
January 16, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 27 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/16/2014.(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schwarzer v. UFCW-Northern California Employer's Joint Pension Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UFCW-Northern California Employer's Joint Pension Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Schwarz
Represented By: Sam Gilmore Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.