Martinez v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Eulalie Francis Whitr Martinez
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00985
Filed: March 5, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to File (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
September 27, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/27/2013. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
September 27, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court FILED IN ERROR
July 1, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REMANDING CASE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/1/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Martinez v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eulalie Francis Whitr Martinez
Represented By: Steven Gilberto Rosales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]