Zavala v. Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas as Trustee Rali 2006-QS8

Plaintiff: Ricardo Zavala
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas as Trustee Rali 2006-QS8
Case Number: 3:2013cv01040
Filed: March 7, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING: ORDER RE SERVICE OF PROCESS ON REMAINING DEFENDANT: re 16 Clerks Notice, 9 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion to Dismiss Hearing reset to 8/1/2013 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 5/15/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
May 29, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: NOTICE REGARDING LEGAL HELP DESK, HANDBOOK FOR LITIGANTS WITHOUT A LAWYER, AND LEGAL STANDARDS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 5/29/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/29/2013: # 2 Legal Help Center Flyer) (ls, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/29/2013: # 3 Pro Se Handbook) (ls, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS AS TRUSTEE RALI 2006-QS8. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/10/2013. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
July 10, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 9 Motion to Dismiss.(lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zavala v. Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas as Trustee Rali 2006-QS8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Zavala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas as Trustee Rali 2006-QS8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.