Rodriguez v. Staples the office superstore, LLC

Plaintiff: Steven Rodriguez
Defendant: Staples the office superstore, LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01076
Filed: March 8, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/4/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
June 26, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 16 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Early Neutral Evaluation by Staples the office superstore, LLC and Steven Rodriguez filed by Staples the office superstore, LLC, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Early Neutral Evaluation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/26/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
July 10, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO APPEAR BY PHONE re 19 Proposed Order filed by Steven Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/10/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
August 22, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulated Protective Order) filed by Staples the office superstore, LLC, PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/22/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
January 30, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/30/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Staples the office superstore, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Rodriguez
Represented By: Norman B. Blumenthal
Represented By: Aparajit Bhowmik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staples the office superstore, LLC
Represented By: Colette M. LeBon
Represented By: Karen Joyce Kubin
Represented By: Tritia Miyuki Murata
Represented By: David Patrick Zins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]