Mizuho Orthopedic Systems, Inc v. Steris Corporation

Plaintiff: Mizuho Orthopedic Systems, Inc
Defendant: Steris Corporation
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01077
Filed: March 8, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 12, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 21 Stipulated Protective Order for Litigation Involving Patents, Highly Sensitive Confidential Information and/or Trade Secrets. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 12, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
June 12, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 22 Stipulated Order re Discovery of Electronically Stored Information. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 12, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
September 30, 2013 32 Featured Case Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 29 Motion for Leave to Amend Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions. Plaintiff shall serve its amended Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions by October 15, 2013.(kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
November 21, 2013 36 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 35 Motion to Amend/Correct ; STERIS Corporation is required to amend its Invalidity Contentions by December 5, 2013. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mizuho Orthopedic Systems, Inc v. Steris Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mizuho Orthopedic Systems, Inc
Represented By: Charles L. Thoeming
Represented By: Theodore J. Bielen, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steris Corporation
Represented By: Craig C Crockett
Represented By: Floyd R. Nation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]