Indemnity Insurance Company of North America v. UPS Ground Freight Inc

Plaintiff: Indemnity Insurance Company of North America
Defendant: UPS Ground Freight Inc
Case Number: 3:2013cv01088
Filed: March 11, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49:81 Damaged Goods While Being Transported
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGE ILLSTON'S ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
June 12, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR TRANSFER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
March 12, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/12/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Indemnity Insurance Company of North America v. UPS Ground Freight Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indemnity Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Joshua A. Southwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPS Ground Freight Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.