Callidus Software Inc v. Xactly Corporation

Defendant: Christopher Cabrera and Xactly Corporation
Plaintiff: Callidus Software Inc
Case Number: 3:2013cv01122
Filed: March 13, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2013 72 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 70 selecting Mediation by Callidus Software Inc and Defendants filed by Callidus Software Inc, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/3/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
October 8, 2013 82 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 78 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Mediation filed by Xactly Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/8/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
November 13, 2013 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Status Conference Re 90 Notice. Status Conference set for 11/21/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Joint Status Conference Statement shall be filed by 11/19/2013. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/13/2013. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
November 26, 2013 97 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO XACTLY re 95 Stipulation filed by Callidus Software Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/26/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 26, 2013 98 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO CABRERA re 96 Stipulation filed by Callidus Software Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/26/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Callidus Software Inc v. Xactly Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Cabrera
Represented By: Corina I Cacovean
Represented By: Jennifer J Schmidt
Represented By: James C Yoon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xactly Corporation
Represented By: James C Yoon
Represented By: Jennifer J Schmidt
Represented By: Charles Tait Graves
Represented By: Corina I Cacovean
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Callidus Software Inc
Represented By: Assad Hussain Rajani
Represented By: Deborah E. Fishman
Represented By: Krista Marie Carter
Represented By: Thomas D Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]