Lawson v. Chabrowski

Defendant: Darius Derek Chabrowski
Plaintiff: Courtney Lawson
Case Number: 3:2013cv01130
Filed: March 13, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 8, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 12 Clerks Notice,. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
April 10, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 4/23/2013.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/10/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
May 2, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REMANDING ACTION TO STATE COURT, DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES, AND VACATING HEARING by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 3 Motion to Remand]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE RECENT FILINGS BY DEFENDANT. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/14/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawson v. Chabrowski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darius Derek Chabrowski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Lawson
Represented By: Timothy James Walton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]