Contra Piracy v. Does 1 - 2919

Defendant: Does 1 - 2919
Plaintiff: Contra Piracy
Case Number: 3:2013cv01133
Filed: March 13, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 9 Brief, filed by Contra Piracy. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 6/20/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
July 23, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 7/23/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 24, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 7/24/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
May 31, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte denying 6 Ex Parte Application ; denying 7 Ex Parte Application. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Contra Piracy v. Does 1 - 2919
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 2919
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Contra Piracy
Represented By: Boden Noel Davidson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]