Justice v. United States

Defendant: United States
Plaintiff: Carlvin Justice
Case Number: 3:2013cv01135
Filed: March 13, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 26:7429 IRS: Tax Jeopardy Assessment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 8, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 9 Clerks Notice,. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
May 28, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO CONTINUE AND CONFIRMING CASE MANAGEMENT DATE [re 14 MOTION to Continue filed by Carlvin Justice]. Actual case management conference date is 6/6/2013 at 11:00 AM. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/28/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
June 7, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO DISMISS re 17 MOTION to Dismiss UNITED STATES NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS filed by United States, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 17 MOTION to Dismiss UNITED STATES NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS. Responses due by 6/27/2013. Replies due by 7/8/2013. Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 7, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
July 25, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William Alsup [granting 17 Motion to Dismiss]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
March 18, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING DOCKET NUMBER 41. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 18, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/18/2014: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Justice v. United States
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: Thomas Moore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlvin Justice
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]