Le Roy-Garcia v. Brave Arts Licensing, LLC et al

Defendant: Yvette Guez, Innovative Business Group, Inc., Juan Pierre Guez, The California Apparel, LLC, Zulily, Inc., Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., Brave Arts Licensing, LLC, Gabriel Guez and Ideeli, Inc.
Plaintiff: Anne-Stephanie Le Roy-Garcia
Case Number: 3:2013cv01181
Filed: March 15, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 16 Plaintiff's and Defendants' Stipulated Motion to Reschedule Hearing. The court CONTINUES the hearing on the eight appearing Defendants' motion to transfer to Wednesday, July 3, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 5/15/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
June 25, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING hearing on 10 Defendants' motion to dismiss. To rule on a motion to dismiss, which is a dispositive motion, all parties to this case must consent to the undersigned's jurisdiction. See 28 U.S.C. § 636. To date, two defendants (Ideeli, Inc.; and HauteLook, Inc.) have yet either to consent to or decline the undersigneds jurisdiction. Accordingly, attached to this order are copies of the forms by which Ideeli, Inc. and HauteLook, Inc. may do so. They shall file either form by July 3, 2013. Furthermore, in light of this complication, undersigned CONTINUES the hearing on the motion to dismiss or, alternatively, to transfer from July 3, 2013 to July 18, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, Unite d States District Court, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, California, 94102. (If this new date does not work for counsel, they may stipulate to move the hearing to another one of the undersigneds civil law and motions calendars (e.g., August 1, 2013; August 15, 2013)). Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 6/25/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
July 9, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING hearing on 10 Defendants' motion to dismiss. To rule on a motion to dismiss, which is a dispositive motion, all parties to this case must consent to the undersigned's jurisdiction. See 28 U.S.C. § 636. To date, one defendant, HauteLook, Inc., has yet to either consent to or decline the undersigneds jurisdiction. Accordingly, attached to this order are copies of the forms by which HauteLook, Inc. may do so. It shall file either form by Wednesday, July 17, 2013. In light of this complication, the undersigned ORDERS Plaintiff to serve a copy of this order on HauteLook, Inc. by Friday, July 12, 2013. Furthermore, the undersigned CONTINUES the hearing on the motion to dismiss or, alternatively, to tran sfer from Thursday, July 18, 2013 to Thursday, August 1, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, United States District Court, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, California, 94102. (If this new date does not work for counsel, they may stip ulate to move the hearing to another one of the undersigneds civil law and motions calendars (e.g., August 15, 2013; September 5, 2013). Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/9/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
August 5, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 10 Defendants' motion to dismiss or, alternatively, to transfer action. The court TRANSFERS this action to the Central District of California. All currently scheduled dates and deadlines are VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/5/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Le Roy-Garcia v. Brave Arts Licensing, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvette Guez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovative Business Group, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Pierre Guez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The California Apparel, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zulily, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neiman Marcus Group, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brave Arts Licensing, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Guez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ideeli, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne-Stephanie Le Roy-Garcia
Represented By: Lawrence Griffith Townsend
Represented By: Linda Joy Kattwinkel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]