Gucci America, Inc. v. Qing et al

Defendant: Fu Mei Qing
Plaintiff: Gucci America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv01198
Filed: March 18, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 36 Application of Stephen M. Gaffigan for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
July 11, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE UPON CONSENT AND SETTING CERTAIN CASE MANAGEMENT DATES. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/11/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
July 11, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Motion to Substitute Attorney 41 . Attorney Julian J. Pardini for Ci Hong Wang added. Attorney Shelley Susan Buchanan terminated. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/11/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
July 11, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION to Substitute Attorney 41 . Attorney Hong Lu for Ci Hong Wang added. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/11/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
August 29, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. The status conference scheduled for 10/15/2013 before Judge Vadas remains scheduled. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/29/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gucci America, Inc. v. Qing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fu Mei Qing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gucci America, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth E. Keller
Represented By: Anne Elizabeth Kearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.