Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. 1233 Polk Street, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music-Z Tunes, LLC, Hotel Bravo Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Shroom Shady Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Fourteenth Hour Music Inc., M Shop Publishing, A Division of Machine Shop Publishing, LLC, Cotillion Music, Inc. and Moebetoblame Music
Defendant: 1233 Polk Street, LLC, Rory Gene Foos and Conor James Nugent
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01211
Filed: March 19, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 7/25/2013. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
August 27, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT 16 . Plaintiffs shall submit additional briefing by 5:00 p.m. on September 9, 2013, to address the deficiencies in the motion for default judgment. Any opposition or statement of non-opposition is due no later than 5:00 p.m. on September 16, 2013. The previously-noticed hearing date on the motion of September 26, 2013 remains unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 08/27/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
September 6, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 22 Motion to Continue .(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
July 3, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 7/3/2014. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
September 2, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 45 First Ex Parte Application re 43 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Set Hearings filed by Broadcast Music, Inc., 44 First Ex Parte Application re 43 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Set Hearings filed by Broadcast Music, Inc. September 3, 2014 Judgment Debtor Examination VACATED. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 9/2/14. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
March 21, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/21/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
April 2, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/20/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/27/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/2/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. 1233 Polk Street, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal, Inc.
Represented By: Julia D. Greer
Represented By: Karen Susanna Frank
Represented By: Jeremiah Joseph Burke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music-Z Tunes, LLC
Represented By: Julia D. Greer
Represented By: Karen Susanna Frank
Represented By: Jeremiah Joseph Burke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hotel Bravo Music
Represented By: Julia D. Greer
Represented By: Karen Susanna Frank
Represented By: Jeremiah Joseph Burke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Jeremiah Joseph Burke
Represented By: Karen Susanna Frank
Represented By: Julia D. Greer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shroom Shady Music
Represented By: Julia D. Greer
Represented By: Karen Susanna Frank
Represented By: Jeremiah Joseph Burke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Julia D. Greer
Represented By: Karen Susanna Frank
Represented By: Jeremiah Joseph Burke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fourteenth Hour Music Inc.
Represented By: Julia D. Greer
Represented By: Karen Susanna Frank
Represented By: Jeremiah Joseph Burke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M Shop Publishing, A Division of Machine Shop Publishing, LLC
Represented By: Jeremiah Joseph Burke
Represented By: Karen Susanna Frank
Represented By: Julia D. Greer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cotillion Music, Inc.
Represented By: Julia D. Greer
Represented By: Karen Susanna Frank
Represented By: Jeremiah Joseph Burke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moebetoblame Music
Represented By: Julia D. Greer
Represented By: Karen Susanna Frank
Represented By: Jeremiah Joseph Burke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1233 Polk Street, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rory Gene Foos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conor James Nugent
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]