Mora v. Efficient Painting Co. et al

Plaintiff: Juan Mora
Defendant: Efficient Painting Co., Pavel Ivanovich Kolosov and Peter Ivanovich Kolosov
Case Number: 3:2013cv01253
Filed: March 20, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Yolo
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court (***DISREGARD - AMENDED ORDER FILED - SEE DOCKET NO. 13 ****) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 11 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013) Modified on 8/14/2013 (rmm2S, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/14/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
December 4, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/4/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
September 10, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PARTIES' STIPULATION TO VACATE ALL DEADLINES PENDING EXECUTION OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. If no dismissal filed within 90 days, Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/18/2014 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/10/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
June 18, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting: 8 MOTION to Continue Initial CMC to Serve Defendants. Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2013. Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2013 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/18/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mora v. Efficient Painting Co. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Mora
Represented By: Huy Ngoc Tran
Represented By: Tomas Eduardo Margain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Efficient Painting Co.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pavel Ivanovich Kolosov
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Ivanovich Kolosov
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]