Commvault Systems, Inc v. PB&J Software, LLC

Plaintiff: Commvault Systems, Inc
Defendant: PB&J Software, LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01332
Filed: March 25, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statutes
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2013 11 Featured Case ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/27/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
May 9, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JOSEPH D. SCHNEIDER PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 9, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2013)
June 3, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The hearing on defendant's motion to dismiss is continued from June 14, 2013 to June 28, 2013, at 9:00 a.m. The Case Management Conference is continued from June 28, 2013 to August 9, 2013; a Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than August 2, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 3, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
June 25, 2013 25 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; VACATING HEARING. The action is dismissed without prejudice to CommVault's refiling its complaint in an appropriate district. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 25, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Commvault Systems, Inc v. PB&J Software, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commvault Systems, Inc
Represented By: Michael K. Friedland
Represented By: Michelle Elle Armond
Represented By: Samantha Y. Hsu
Represented By: John B. Sganga, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PB&J Software, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]