Gitson et al v. Trader Joe's Company

Plaintiff: Amy Gitson, Christine Vodicka and Deborah Ross
Defendant: Trader Joe's Company
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01333
Filed: March 25, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2013 15 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 14 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/13. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
April 24, 2013 20 Featured Case NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 23, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 24, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Hon. William Alsup denying 19 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
July 29, 2013 40 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Request For Order Changing Time Relating To Defendant's Motion To Dismiss and, in the Alternative, Motion To Strike and Request for Judicial Notice Response/Opposition to motion due b y 8/16/2013. Reply due by 8/30/2013. Motion Hearing on 35 Motion to Dismiss set for 9/18/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/29/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
September 17, 2013 44 Featured Case ORDER VACATING HEARING DATE re 35 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Trader Joe's Company. The hearing noticed for September 18, 2013, is VACATED. The motion will be taken under submission and decided on the papers. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/17/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
October 4, 2013 45 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS 35 MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STRIKE by Judge William H. Orrick. The motion to dismiss is DENIED as to the plaintiffs' first cause of action to the extent that it is pr edicated on violations of the Sherman Law. The plaintiffs' second through sixth causes of action under the UCL, FAL and CLRA are DISMISSED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. The plaintiffs' seventh cause of action for restitution is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Paragraphs 58-67 of the FAC are ordered stricken. The plaintiffs may file an amended complaint within 20 days of this Order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
January 6, 2014 61 Featured Case STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER AMENDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 58 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 8/26/2014. Case Management Conference set for 9/2/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Dis covery cutoff: 10/10/2014. Dispositive motions to be heard by 12/17/2014. Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2015 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 3/23/2015 08:30 AM, both in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/06/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
March 14, 2014 68 Featured Case ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William H. Orrick granting in part and denying in part 51 Motion to Dismiss. The motion to dismiss is DENIED on the first through sixth causes of action for violations of the UCL, FAL, and CLRA on claims regard ing the ECJ Products. The Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND on the first through sixth causes of action on claims regarding the Soy Milk Products and the Undisclosed Additives Products. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint within 20 days of the date of this Order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
May 19, 2014 93 Featured Case ORDER directing parties to file supplemental briefs by June 2, 2014 and rescheduling hearing to June 26, 2014. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/19/14. (vclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
June 17, 2014 99 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER RE STIPULATION TO RESCHEDULE 82 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Strike 76 Amended Complaint , 74 MOTION to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal re 68 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, and MOTION to Stay . Motion Hearing set for 8/7/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/17/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gitson et al v. Trader Joe's Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Gitson
Represented By: Ben F. Pierce Gore
Represented By: Colin Harvey Dunn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Vodicka
Represented By: Ben F. Pierce Gore
Represented By: Colin Harvey Dunn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Ross
Represented By: Colin Harvey Dunn
Represented By: Ben F. Pierce Gore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trader Joe's Company
Represented By: Kate G Ides
Represented By: Daniel James Faria
Represented By: Randall W. Edwards
Represented By: Carla Jean Christofferson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]