Benz v. The Clorox Company

Defendant: The Clorox Company
Plaintiff: Carol Benz
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01361
Filed: March 26, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2013 10 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/2012. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
May 14, 2013 13 Featured Case ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Hon. William Alsup [granting 12 Stipulation]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
July 10, 2013 15 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS re 14 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by The Clorox Company. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/10/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
August 19, 2013 22 Featured Case AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS (Private ADR - Mediation) re 20 STIPULATION and Proposed Order. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/19/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
August 26, 2013 24 Featured Case STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR STANDARD LITIGATION re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by The Clorox Company. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/26/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
November 5, 2013 28 Featured Case CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/05/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
December 9, 2013 30 Featured Case STIPULATED ORDER TO EXTEND EXPERT DEADLINES re 29 Proposed Order filed by The Clorox Company. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/09/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
February 13, 2014 42 Featured Case Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting in part and denying in part 41 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. The Clerk is directed to UNSEAL Exhibit A to the Rajaratnam Declaration Docket No. 41-4. The Clerk is directed to UNSEAL Exhibit 7 to the Bolding Deposition Docket No. 41-6. Exhibit 17 to the Bolding Deposition, Docket No. 41-8, shall REMAIN FILED UNDER SEAL.(jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
April 7, 2014 58 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - summary judgment is GRANTED to defendant. Plaintiff's 56 administrative motion to file under seal is GRANTED. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/07/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Benz v. The Clorox Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Clorox Company
Represented By: Susan Wallis Pangborn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Benz
Represented By: Dennis John Woodruff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]