Leglu v. County of Santa Clara

Defendant: County of Santa Clara
Plaintiff: Carlos Leglu, Jr.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01376
Filed: March 27, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/31/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
January 9, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/9/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
March 17, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 20 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND LAST DAY TO HEAR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS CORRECTION OF DOCKET. Jury Selection set for 9/10/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. J effrey S. White. Jury Trial set for 9/15/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 8/25/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/17/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
April 21, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 04/21/2014. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
May 9, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due on or before 05/27/2014 - Replies due by 6/3/2014. Jury Selection set for 11/10/2014. Jury Trial set for 11/10/2014 09:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 10/30/2 014 02:30 PM. Pretrial Conference set for 10/30/2014 02:30 PM. Hearings to be held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman Courtroom #3, 5th Floor 280 South First Street San Jose, CA 95113.before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 05/09/2014. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 13, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due on or before 05/27/2014 - Replies due by 6/10/2014. Jury Selection set for 11/10/2014. Jury Trial set for 11/10/2014 09:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 10/30/201 4 02:30 PM. Pretrial Conference set for 10/30/2014 02:30 PM. Hearings to be held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman Courtroom #3, 5th Floor 280 South First Street San Jose, CA 95113 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 05/13/2014. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2014)
May 16, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 40 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 1. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
August 20, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Beth Labson Freeman granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion for Summary Judgment. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
April 1, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/1/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Leglu v. County of Santa Clara
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Santa Clara
Represented By: John Lewis Winchester, III
Represented By: Orry Phillip Korb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Leglu, Jr.
Represented By: John Paul Flynn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]