Longs Drug Stores California, L.L.C. et al v. City of Sebastopol et al

Defendant: City Council of the City of Sebastopol, City of Sebastopol and Glenn Schainblatt
Plaintiff: Longs Drug Stores California, L.L.C. and Armstrong Development Properties
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01383
Filed: March 28, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2013 16 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Seeking Extension of Time for Hearing of Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Abstension filed by Longs Drug Stores California, L.L.C., Armstrong Development Properties, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Seeking Extension of Time for Hearing of Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Abstension. Responses due by 5/29/2013. Replies due by 6/5/2013. Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. CMC reset for 6/27/13 at 1:30 p.m.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/22/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
June 10, 2013 21 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Glenn Schainblatt, City Council of the City of Sebastopol, City of Sebastopol, Motions terminated: 12 MOTION to Di smiss filed by Glenn Schainblatt, City Council of the City of Sebastopol, City of Sebastopol, 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Glenn Schainblatt, City Council of the City of Sebastopol, City of Sebastopol.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/10/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
October 11, 2013 34 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Case Management Statement due by 10/24/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/11/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
November 5, 2013 38 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/5/13. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
February 12, 2014 61 Featured Case ORDER to Show Cause Regarding this Court's Jurisdiction over Plaintiffs' Writ of Mandate Claims (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
April 2, 2014 72 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 71 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Discovery Deadlines filed by Longs Drug Stores California, L.L.C., Armstrong Development Properties. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/2/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
April 17, 2014 74 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 73 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Hearing on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Case Management Conference filed by Longs Drug Stores California, L.L.C., Armstrong Development Properties, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 73 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Hearing on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Case Management Conference, 42 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2014 0 1:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Status Report due by 5/29/2014. Status Conference set for 6/5/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/17/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
April 15, 2013 8 Featured Case STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/15/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Longs Drug Stores California, L.L.C. et al v. City of Sebastopol et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Council of the City of Sebastopol
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sebastopol
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Schainblatt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Longs Drug Stores California, L.L.C.
Represented By: Robert Rory Moore
Represented By: Andrew Charles Mayer
Represented By: David H. Blackwell
Represented By: Michael J. Betz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armstrong Development Properties
Represented By: Andrew Charles Mayer
Represented By: David H. Blackwell
Represented By: Michael J. Betz
Represented By: Robert Rory Moore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]