Soltanizad et al v. Didar Persian Cuisine et al

Plaintiff: Hamid Soltanizad and Margory K. Nunez Liza
Defendant: Didar Persian Cuisine, Ahmad Nikmorad and Soudabeh Nikmorad
Case Number: 3:2013cv01392
Filed: March 28, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 9 Motion For Case Management Conference AND ORDERING Plaintiffs to Serve Defendants. Case Management Statement due by 3/21/2014. Case Management Conference set for 3/28/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 13, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
March 25, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SERVE DEFENDANTS; DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE PROOFS OF SERVICE; AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE NOTICE RE CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Case Management Statement due by 5/30/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/6/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/25/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
April 9, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Re 34 Stipulation. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soltanizad et al v. Didar Persian Cuisine et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hamid Soltanizad
Represented By: Thomas E. Frankovich
Represented By: George Salah Khoury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margory K. Nunez Liza
Represented By: Thomas E. Frankovich
Represented By: George Salah Khoury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Didar Persian Cuisine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahmad Nikmorad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soudabeh Nikmorad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.